Global Patent Index - EP 1254858 A1

EP 1254858 A1 2002-11-06 - Lifting system for a stairway

Title (en)

Lifting system for a stairway

Title (de)

Hubanlage für Treppe

Title (fr)

Système de levage pour escalier

Publication

EP 1254858 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01201651 A

Priority

EP 01201651 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a lifting system for a stairway comprising a first section (A) including lifting means (4a). Further, it comprises a second section (B) including a number of steps (2), step controlling means (3, 5, 11) and sliding means (4b, 9), and at least one flexible connection (C) connecting said first (A) and second sections (B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/0853 (2013.01); B66B 9/0869 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254858 A1 20021106; EP 1254858 B1 20041103; AT 281396 T 20041115; DE 60106866 D1 20041209; DE 60106866 T2 20051201; DK 1254858 T3 20050314

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2006-02-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LIFT-UP I/S

2005-03-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050214

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-01-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LIFT-UP I/S

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60106866 P 20041209

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-10-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIELSEN, JOHN BO

2004-10-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRISTIANSEN, ERIK

2004-10-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERIKSEN, FLEMMING

2004-03-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIELSEN, JOHN BO

2004-03-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRISTIANSEN, ERIK

2004-03-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERIKSEN, FLEMMING

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIFT-UP I/S

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIELSEN, JOHN BO

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRISTIANSEN, ERIK

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI