Global Patent Index - EP 1254948 A1

EP 1254948 A1 2002-11-06 - Gemini surfactants

Title (en)

Gemini surfactants

Title (de)

Geminitenside

Title (fr)

Tensioactifs gemini

Publication

EP 1254948 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009407 A

Priority

DE 10121724 A

Abstract (en)

Geminitensides (I), i.e. polyethylene glycol bis-(2-hydroxyalk(en)yl) ether derivatives, are new. Geminitensides of formula RCH(OH)CH2-(OCH2CH2)x-OCH2CH(OH)R (I) are new. R = alkyl and/or alkenyl of 4-22C; x = 5-90. An Independent claim is included for rinsing or cleansing compositions (A) containing (I), together with other conventional components.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Geminitenside, gegebenenfalls in Verbindung mit in Spül- und Reinigungsmittel üblichen Inhaltsstoffen, gegebenenfalls mit weiteren nichtionischen Tensiden und anionischen Tensiden, sowie die Verwendung derartiger Geminitenside zur Verbesserung des Netzverhaltens und der Kunststoffverträglichkeit, zur vereinfachten Herstellung von festen Reinigem und als schaumdämpfendes Tensid in Klarspülformulierungen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 1/8255 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254948 A1 20021106; EP 1254948 B1 20040714; DE 10121724 A1 20021107; ES 2225684 T3 20050316; US 2003078176 A1 20030424; US 6794345 B2 20040921

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160426

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160425

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160425

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160425

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50200615

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225684 T3

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200615 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI