Global Patent Index - EP 1254979 A1

EP 1254979 A1 2002-11-06 - Woven strap

Title (en)

Woven strap

Title (de)

Gewebtes Gurtband

Title (fr)

Sangle tissée

Publication

EP 1254979 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02370017 A

Priority

FR 0105885 A

Abstract (en)

The strap (1), comprising warp (2) and weft (3) strands, has at least one spiral steel winding (4) running parallel to the warp strands. The wire spirals are located inside sleeves along the edges or center of the strap, made from doubled and stitched layers of the textile material, with the ends of the spirals fixed to the sleeves.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapport à une sangle tissée se composant de fils (2) de chaîne et de fils (3) de trame. Cette sangle est caractérisée en ce qu'elle comprend parallèlement aux fils de chaîne au moins un fil (4) d'acier spiralé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 1/00; D03D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 1/00 (2006.01); D03D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 3/005 (2013.01); D03D 1/00 (2013.01); D03D 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254979 A1 20021106; FR 2824337 A1 20021108; FR 2824337 B1 20040123

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050414

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI