Global Patent Index - EP 1254981 A2

EP 1254981 A2 2002-11-06 - Device for ruffling sheet-like material, especially textile or leather material

Title (en)

Device for ruffling sheet-like material, especially textile or leather material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Kräuseln von tuchartigem Material, insbesondere von textilem Material oder von Leder

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour froncer un matériau en forme de feuille, en particulier matériau textile ou cuir

Publication

EP 1254981 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008985 A

Priority

DE 10121669 A

Abstract (en)

A textile (a) gathering (c) assembly (5) has two intermeshing gears (6, 7) which discharge the gathered fabric with a fixing band (b) to a sewing station. The two gears are esp. bevelled and intermesh at the point of their largest diameter. The upper cog (6) with bearing shaft (8) rotates between a height-adjustable bearing bracket (10) and the sewing machine (1). The horizontal bearing bracket (10) is secured to the sewing machine head by a swivel-float pin (12) coupled to a rising and falling step drive motor (15).

Abstract (de)

Eine Kräuselvorrichtung (5) weist ein in verzahnungsartigem Eingriff stehendes sowie drehangetriebenes Zahnradpaar (6 und 7) auf, durch das zur Erzeugung einer Kräuselung (c) ein tuchartiges Material (a) hindurchgeführt und sodann mit einem Fixierband (b) vernäht wird. Damit das Zahnradpaar (6 und 7) um starke Krümmungen eines tuchartigen Materials (a) herumgeführt werden kann, sind die beiden Zahnräder (6 und 7) jeweils kegelstumpfförmig gestaltet und stehen dabei an ihrem größten Durchmesserbereich miteinander in Eingriff. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 35/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254981 A2 20021106; EP 1254981 A3 20040102; EP 1254981 B1 20070103; DE 10121669 A1 20021107; DE 50209125 D1 20070215

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100423

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100423

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090606

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209125 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI