Global Patent Index - EP 1254992 A1

EP 1254992 A1 2002-11-06 - Dwelling composed of prefabricated elements and method for mounting

Title (en)

Dwelling composed of prefabricated elements and method for mounting

Title (de)

Wohnhaus aus vorgefertigten Elementen und Verfahren zu seiner Montage

Title (fr)

Habitation constituée d'éléments préfabriqués et son procédé de montage

Publication

EP 1254992 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02370013 A

Priority

FR 0106035 A

Abstract (en)

The dwelling has a vertical wall (2) and a roof, the wall being formed from modular elements (2A) having a groove (4) on each vertical side extending from the foot to some distance from the upper edge. The modular element has an outward projecting rib (5). An Independent claim is included for a method of erecting the dwelling.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte à une habitation constituée d'éléments préfabriqués présentant une paroi (2) latérale globalement verticale et un toit (3) caractérisée en ce que la paroi (2) latérale est formée d'éléments modulaires (2A) dits bas présentant de chaque côté vertical une entaille (4) s'étendant du pied de l'élément modulaire pour s'arrêter à distance du bord supérieur de cet élément modulaire bas et bordant cette entaille, l'élément modulaire bas présente une nervure (5) en saillie vers l'extérieur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/3211 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254992 A1 20021106; FR 2824342 A1 20021108

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040524

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI