Global Patent Index - EP 1254997 A2

EP 1254997 A2 2002-11-06 - Mounting arrangement for an awning and awning including such an arrangement

Title (en)

Mounting arrangement for an awning and awning including such an arrangement

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Markise und Markise mit einer solchen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le montage d'une marquise et marquise comportant un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1254997 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02252081 A

Priority

  • EP 02252081 A
  • EP 01201120 A

Abstract (en)

An awning including a head box having an elongated housing (5), first and second end members (9) on opposite confronting first and second longitudinal ends of the housing (5) and a roller (7) mounted for rotation in the housing between the first and second end members (9), so as to be rotatable about an axis coextending in parallel with the elongated housing and a pair of mounting brackets (13) for securing the head box to a building, each bracket (13) comprising a mounting section for attachment to a surface of the building and a holding section extending forwardly of the mounting section wherein, each of the first and second end members (9) is pivotally engageable with the holding section of a respective one of the pair of brackets about a pivot pin (57) parallel to the roller axis and by an adjustable engagement (33,35,37) between each end member and each mounting bracket to adjustably fix the angular position of the end housing and wherein the adjustable engagement (33,35,37) can be snap-fitted together. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0637 (2013.01); E04F 10/0618 (2013.01); E04F 10/0662 (2013.01); E04F 10/0688 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254997 A2 20021106; EP 1254997 A3 20040102

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI