Global Patent Index - EP 1254998 A2

EP 1254998 A2 2002-11-06 - Post support, especially for a railing system

Title (en)

Post support, especially for a railing system

Title (de)

Pfostenhalter, insbesondere für ein Geländersystem

Title (fr)

Support de poteau, notamment pour un système garde-corps

Publication

EP 1254998 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007798 A

Priority

DE 10121900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10121900A1] The post mounting has a post element holding unit fastened to a base component fastened to a wall. The post element holding unit has at least one clamping device (22) and at least one alignment device (24) which are spaced apart and for independent clamping and alignment of the post element. The clamping unit has a post element holding component (26) connected with positional stability to the base section (18). A clamping component (28), which in the clamping position is in contact with the post element, is fastened to the holding component by means of a detachable non-destructive clamping connection (30).

Abstract (de)

Der Pfostenhalter (12), insbesondere für ein Geländersystem (10), weist eine Pfostenelement-Aufnahmeeinheit (14) auf, die an einem an einer Wandung (16) fixierbaren Basisteil (18) befestigt ist. Hierbei ist vorgesehen, dass die Pfostenelement-Aufnahmeeinheit (14) mindestens eine Klemmeinheit (22) und mindestens eine Ausrichteinheit (24) zur unabhängigen Klemmung und Ausrichtung des Pfostenrohres (20) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/1812 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254998 A2 20021106; EP 1254998 A3 20031119; DE 10121900 A1 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-09-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI