Global Patent Index - EP 1255003 A2

EP 1255003 A2 2002-11-06 - Tombstones

Title (en)

Tombstones

Title (de)

Grabstein

Title (fr)

Pierre tombale

Publication

EP 1255003 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005836 A

Priority

DE 20107435 U

Abstract (en)

An ornamental, lightweight gravestone has a hollow basic shape made out of any suitable material which can be formed, e.g. metals. The outside of the shape is provided with a decorative finish and has a flat (5) for applying a plaque. The shape has a base (12) which is fitted over a base slab (11) to which it is secured by screw fasteners (12). The outer decoration can include crosses and decorative leaves, branches etc.

Abstract (de)

Grabstein mit einem dreidimensionalen Körper, dessen Unterseite als verankerungsfähiger Fuß ausgebildet ist und dessen Vorderseite eine in der Regel ebene, für die Anbringung der Inschrift vorgesehene Fläche aufweist, wobei der dreidimensionale Körper als Hohlkörper (1) ausgebildet ist und die Wände des Hohlkörpers aus einem vorzugsweise plattenförmigen Material gebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107435 U1 20010628; EP 1255003 A2 20021106; EP 1255003 A3 20040128

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-11-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI