Global Patent Index - EP 1255004 A2

EP 1255004 A2 2002-11-06 - Door handle unit

Title (en)

Door handle unit

Title (de)

Türgriffeinheit

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte

Publication

EP 1255004 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003879 A

Priority

DE 10121432 A

Abstract (en)

Door handle unit for a motor vehicle door lock comprises a handle (1), and an adapter plate (3) fixed on a door (2) for pivotably receiving a bearing arm (4) of the handle. In a first step the handle is inserted in a bushing (5) on the adapter plate to form a signal connection, and in a second step the handle including the bushing is moved into its functional position. Preferred Features: The handle and the bushing form a socket connection in a direction (6) perpendicular to the door plane (E). The handle is moved into its functional position in the direction (7) of the door plane.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Türgriffeinheit für einen Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss, mit einer Handhabe (1), und mit einer an einer Tür (2) befestigten Adapterplatte (3) zur drehbeweglichen Aufnahme eines Lagerarms (4) der Handhabe (1). Die Handhabe (1) und eine Buchse (5) an der Adapterplatte (3) gehen im Zuge des Anbaus der Handhabe (1) an die Adapterplatte (3) eine Signalverbindung ein. Erfindungsgemäß wird im Rahmen einer ersten Einbauphase die Handhabe (1) in die Buchse (5) zur Signalverbindung in im Wesentlichen senkrechter Richtung (6) im Vergleich zur Türebene (E) eingesteckt, oder umgekehrt. Im Zuge einer zweiten Einbauphase wird die Handhabe (1) inklusive Buchse (5) in ihre Funktionsstellung in Richtung (7) der Türebene (E) verschoben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/00; E05B 65/20; E05G 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/78 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255004 A2 20021106; EP 1255004 A3 20040204; EP 1255004 B1 20060726; DE 10121432 A1 20021107; DE 50207592 D1 20060907; US 2002177331 A1 20021128; US 6602077 B2 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207592 P 20060907

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 1/00 A

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05G 5/02 B

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/20 B

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI