Global Patent Index - EP 1255005 A1

EP 1255005 A1 2002-11-06 - Bolt fitting

Title (en)

Bolt fitting

Title (de)

Riegelbeschlag

Title (fr)

Ferrure avec tige de verrouillage

Publication

EP 1255005 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01110623 A

Priority

EP 01110623 A

Abstract (en)

Lock (10) for doors, windows, etc. comprises a rosette body (60) fixed on a door or window leaf, a rotating handle (12) axially fixed with a handle neck (18) on the rosette body, and a lock part (80) arranged on the door or window frame. On operating the handle a locking element (40) at least partly engages with holding surfaces (104) in the lock part. The locking element is a stud protruding perpendicularly from the handle neck and inserted with its head (46) into a locking nut (84) of the lock part in which it is clamped in two directions running at an angle to each other. Preferred Features: The locking bolt is screwed into a radial stepped bore (32) of an insert (30) which sits in a fixed manner in the handle neck.

Abstract (de)

Ein Riegelbeschlag (10) für Türen, Fenster o. dgl. hat einen Rosettenkörper (60) zur axialfest/drehbaren Lagerung eines Griffs (12) und einen tür- oder fensterrahmenseitig befestigbaren Schließteil (80), an dem durch Betätigung des Griffs (12) ein Riegelelement (40) festlegbar ist, nämlich ein am Griffhals (18) quer abstehender Schraubbolzen (40). Sein Flanschkopf (46) ist in eine Riegelnut (84) des Schließteils (80) einführbar und darin in zwei zueinander winkelig verlaufenden Richtungen verklemmbar. Der Riegelbolzen (40) sitzt an einem im Griffhals (18) drehfesten Einsatz (30), an dem der Rosettenkörper (60) mit einer Bodenschraube (38) befestigt ist. Die z.B. glockenförmige Riegelnut (84) hat an einem breiteren Einlaufteil (85) Gleitflächen, namentlich eine Schräge (100) und Rampen (102, 104), die der dadurch leicht eingeführte Riegelkopf (46) hintergreift. Im Schließteil (80) sitzt die mit einer Fang-Rundung (105) endende Riegelnut (84) exzentrisch nahe einer Außenwand (82). Eine innere Tasche (88) hält eine Justierplatte (94), deren Lage und/oder Form bei einer Kammer (86) mit einer Justierschraube (98) verstellbar ist. Der Griffhals (18) faßt einen Schließzylinder (22), dessen Schließbolzen (26) zum Arretieren des Griffes (12) in Bohrungen (56; 66) von Rosetten-Bauteilen (52; 60) vorschiebbar ist. Am Griffkopf ist in einem Abstand zu dem Bolzen (40) ein Zusatz-Riegelelement vorhanden, z.B. eine Rundnase (14) zum alternativen Eingriff in die Riegelnut (84). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 13/10; E05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05C 3/04 (2006.01); E05B 63/12 (2006.01); E05B 63/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 3/043 (2013.01); E05B 13/106 (2013.01); E05B 15/025 (2013.01); E05B 63/12 (2013.01); E05B 63/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255005 A1 20021106; EP 1255005 B1 20030730; AT 246300 T 20030815; DE 50100442 D1 20030904; DK 1255005 T3 20031110

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100442

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100442

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OLBRICHT, BUCHHOLD, KEULERTZ PA, DE

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-05-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2004-08-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-04-05 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040402

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-12-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-11-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-11-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-10-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100442 P 20030904

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI