Global Patent Index - EP 1255007 A1

EP 1255007 A1 2002-11-06 - Locking mechanism for motor vehicle door and arrangement of such device on a wall of said door

Title (en)

Locking mechanism for motor vehicle door and arrangement of such device on a wall of said door

Title (de)

Verriegelung für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür und Anordnung einer solchen Vorrichtung auf einer Wand dieser Tür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile et agencement de ce dispositif sur une paroi de cet ouvrant

Publication

EP 1255007 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02009927 A

Priority

FR 0106032 A

Abstract (en)

The locking mechanism comprises a base plate (14) including a support (16) with a housing (18) for a lock barrel and a sealing joint (34) pressed against the base plate. The housing includes a barrel access end (18A). The joint comprises an extension forming a sealing part (36) for the barrel access end which has a skirt (38) engaging a complementary edge (40) of the support delimiting the housing access end.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif de verrouillage pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile comporte une platine (14) comprenant un support (16) muni d'un logement (18) destiné à recevoir un barillet (17) de serrure, et un joint d'étanchéité (34) plaqué contre la platine (14). Le logement (18) comprend une extrémité (18A) d'accès au barillet. Le joint comprend un prolongement formant un organe d'obturation (36) de l'extrémité d'accès (18A) du logement. De préférence, l'organe d'obturation (36) est muni d'une jupe (38) coopérant par emboîtement étanche avec un bord complémentaire (40) du support (16) délimitant l'extrémité d'accès (18A) du logement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/183 (2013.01); E05B 17/181 (2013.01); E05B 85/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255007 A1 20021106; EP 1255007 B1 20060201; DE 60208947 D1 20060413; DE 60208947 T2 20060810; ES 2254551 T3 20060616; FR 2824349 A1 20021108; FR 2824349 B1 20031226

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140504

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S., CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 60208947

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140503

2015-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60208947

2014-10-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2254551 T3

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60208947 P 20060413

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-02-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040917

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI