Global Patent Index - EP 1255008 A2

EP 1255008 A2 2002-11-06 - Adjustable cylinder with vacant/engaged notice

Title (en)

Adjustable cylinder with vacant/engaged notice

Title (de)

Verstellbarer Zylinder mit Offen/Geschlossen-Anzeige

Title (fr)

Cylindre réglable avec indicateur de déverrouillage ou verrouillage

Publication

EP 1255008 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02447083 A

Priority

BE 200100315 A

Abstract (en)

An adjustable cylinder (1) with vacant/engaged notice constructed as an insert for door locks of for example toilets, cubicles, and the like, the cylinder (1) comprising a housing (2) in which a shaft (3) is rotatably mounted, a driver plug (4) for engaging a bolt of the door lock being mounted on the shaft (3), a grip (7) for turning the shaft (3) being fixed to a first end (5) of the shaft and an outwardly visible indicator (8) being provided on a second end (6) of the shaft (3), the indicator (8) having two different indications (9, 10) for providing the vacant/engaged notice, the shaft (3) and driver plug (4) being rotatable between two limits of a predefined work sector which are in a relation to the indications (9, 10) of the indicator (8), the cylinder (1) further comprising adjusting means (11) for adjusting the relation between the limits of the work sector and the indications of the indicator (8), the adjusting means being accessible from outside the housing (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 41/00 (2006.01); E05B 9/10 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/105 (2013.01); E05B 41/00 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01); E05B 65/0035 (2013.01); E05B 2009/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255008 A2 20021106; EP 1255008 A3 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-12-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI