Global Patent Index - EP 1255014 A1

EP 1255014 A1 2002-11-06 - Structure and sliding door of a vehicle

Title (en)

Structure and sliding door of a vehicle

Title (de)

Struktur und Schiebetür eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Structure et porte coulissante de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1255014 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290764 A

Priority

  • FR 0105989 A
  • FR 0109413 A

Abstract (en)

The door (1) is held and guided by three arms (3,5,7) engaging three guide rails (4,6,8). The ends (B,C,A) of the arms slide in the rails to form a fictitious triangle (ABC) for holding the door when it is in both the closed and open positions.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un agencement d'une porte coulissante de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens de maintien et de guidage de la porte (1) entre une position ouverte et une position fermée par rapport à la structure (2) du véhicule, caractérisé en ce que les moyens de maintien et de guidage sont constitués de trois bras (3, 5, 7) coopérant respectivement avec trois rails (4, 6, 8) de guidage, les moyens de maintien et de guidage étant dimensionnés et disposés relativement de façon que les extrémités (B, C, A) des bras (3, 5, 7) coulissant dans les rails (4, 6, 8) forment les sommets d'un triangle fictif (ABC) de maintien de la porte aussi bien lorsque la porte (1) est en position fermée que lorsqu'elle est en position ouverte. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/1081 (2013.01); E05D 15/101 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1089 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1092 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255014 A1 20021106; EP 1255014 B1 20050420; DE 60203758 D1 20050525; DE 60203758 T2 20060302; ES 2237653 T3 20050801; FR 2824357 A1 20021108; FR 2824357 B1 20040123

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60203758

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090328

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-02-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070117

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237653 T3

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60203758 P 20050525

2005-05-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STRUCTURE AND SLIDING DOOR OF A VEHICLE

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI