Global Patent Index - EP 1255017 A1

EP 1255017 A1 2002-11-06 - Driving assembly with a floating motor for two mechanisms, particularly for shutters

Title (en)

Driving assembly with a floating motor for two mechanisms, particularly for shutters

Title (de)

Antriebseinrichtung mit schwimmendem Motor für zwei Mechanismen, insbesondere für Klappladen

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'entraînement à moteur flottant de deux mécanismes, notamment pour volets à battants

Publication

EP 1255017 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291117 A

Priority

FR 0106025 A

Abstract (en)

The drive for a shutter door has two parallel axes (20) to open and close the two leaves, with the drive assembly between the axes. The drive has an electric motor (24) with its armature (26) connected to one of the shafts and an inductor (28) connected to the other. The electric motor can be integrated into a motor-gearbox itself mounted in a tubular housing (32). The motor-gearbox output shaft is connected to the armature.

Abstract (fr)

L'objet de l'invention est un ensemble d'entraînement de deux axes (20) parallèles, notamment utilisés pour engendrer le mouvement d'ouverture ou de fermeture de deux battants (12), ledit dispositif étant disposé entre lesdits axes (20). Ledit ensemble d'entraînement comprend un moteur électrique (24) comportant un induit (26) relié cinématiquement à un des axes (20.1) ainsi qu'un inducteur (28) relié cinématiquement à l'autre axe (20.2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 17/00; E05F 5/12; E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 5/12 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01); E05F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 17/004 (2013.01); E05F 5/12 (2013.01); E05F 15/63 (2013.01); E05F 15/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255017 A1 20021106; EP 1255017 B1 20040204; AT 259025 T 20040215; DE 60200200 D1 20040311; DE 60200200 T2 20050728; FR 2824359 A1 20021108; FR 2824359 B1 20030627

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FAAC FRANCE, FR

- Effective date: 20150309

2015-02-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FAAC FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOLTEC, ST DENIS DE PILE, FR

- Document: DE 60200200

- Effective date: 20150112

2015-02-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200200

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20150112

2015-01-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200200

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2014-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FAAC FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOLTEC, FR

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOLTEC

- Free text: VOLTEC#76 ROUTE DE PARIS#33910 ST DENIS DE PILE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- VOLTEC#76 ROUTE DE PARIS#33910 ST DENIS DE PILE (FR)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOLTEC

- Free text: VOLTEC#ZONE INDUSTRIELLE BENTEJAC N 4#33660 SAINT SEURIN SUR L'ISLE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- VOLTEC#76 ROUTE DE PARIS#33910 ST DENIS DE PILE (FR)

2004-06-02 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER

- Owner name: VOLTEC

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-05-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040515

2004-05-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200200 P 20040311

2004-03-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI