Global Patent Index - EP 1255018 A2

EP 1255018 A2 2002-11-06 - Method and apparatus for mounting window boards

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for mounting window boards

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung und -verfahren für Fensterbänke

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode de fixation pour appuis de fenêtre

Publication

EP 1255018 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253149 A

Priority

GB 0110969 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus and method of locating window boards (22) in the required position with regard to a corresponding window frame (18) and securing same to an interior wall (12) characterised by the providing a window board (22) being formed with location means (26), providing fixing means (28) which are adapted to be received in the location means (26) and locating said fixing means (28) in position within the location means (26). The fixing means (28) is then bent or flexed into the internal wall (12) and fixed thereto through the pre-drilled holes in the fixing means (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/702 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255018 A2 20021106; EP 1255018 A3 20030702; GB 0110969 D0 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-04-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI