Global Patent Index - EP 1255029 A1

EP 1255029 A1 2002-11-06 - Sub-assembly for a motor vehicle with an expansion tank

Title (en)

Sub-assembly for a motor vehicle with an expansion tank

Title (de)

Baugruppe für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit einem Ausgleichbehälter

Title (fr)

Sous-ensemble de véhicule automobile comportant un vase d'expansion

Publication

EP 1255029 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291114 A

Priority

FR 0105979 A

Abstract (en)

The expansion bottle (10) is connected to a support (12) integral with the vehicle structure. The connection comprises an element (20) which can move relative to the support. A part (14) which can move relative to the support is able to enter into contact with the bottle and cause its displacement.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un sous ensemble de véhicule automobile comportant un vase d'expansion (10) relié par des moyens de liaison à un support (12) solidaire de la structure dudit véhicule, caractérisé en ce que les moyens de liaison comportent au moins un élément (20) monté à mobilité par rapport audit support (12). Un organe (14) monté à mobilité par rapport audit support (12) et apte à entrer en contact avec ledit vase d'expansion (10) et à en provoquer le déplacement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/029 (2013.01); F01P 2070/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255029 A1 20021106; EP 1255029 B1 20070829; DE 60222047 D1 20071011; DE 60222047 T2 20080529; ES 2290258 T3 20080216; FR 2824309 A1 20021108; FR 2824309 B1 20030801

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080530

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290258 T3

2007-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222047 P 20071011

2007-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2007-08-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI