Global Patent Index - EP 1255039 A2

EP 1255039 A2 2002-11-06 - Fuel injector

Title (en)

Fuel injector

Title (de)

Kraftstoffinjektor

Title (fr)

Injecteur de combustible

Publication

EP 1255039 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02100373 A

Priority

DE 10121531 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6719221B2] The fuel injector has a housing that is formed from at least one nozzle tension nut, a first injector module and a second injector module. The first injector module and the second injector module adjoin one another and are disposed in the nozzle tension nut. A fuel high-pressure bore is led through the first injector module and the second injector module. A fuel return bore is disposed in the housing. Contact surfaces between the injector modules form a first gap that adjoins the high-pressure bore. Contact surfaces between the nozzle tension nut and the injector modules form a second gap that is connected to the first gap. The return line adjoins the second gap for the discharge of fuel that has entered the second gap from the high-pressure bore via the first gap. The fuel injector is such that the second gap is sealed off relative to the surroundings of the fuel injector.

Abstract (de)

Der Kraftstoffinjektor weist ein Gehäuse auf, das mindestens aus einer Düsenspannmutter (DS), einem ersten Injektormodul (I1) und einem zweiten Injektormodul (I2) gebildet wird. Das erste Injektormodul (I1) und das zweite Injektormodul (I2) grenzen aneinander an und sind in der Düsenspannmutter (DS) angeordnet. Eine Hochdruckbohrung (H) für Kraftstoff ist durch das erste Injektormodul (I1) und das zweite Injektormodul (I2) geführt. Eine Rücklaufbohrung (R) für Kraftstoff ist im Gehäuse angeordnet. Kontaktflächen zwischen den Injektormodulen (I1, I2) bilden eine erste Spalte (S1), die an die Hochdruckbohrung (H) angrenzt. Kontaktflächen zwischen der Düsenspannmutter (DS) und den Injektormodulen (I1, I2) bilden eine zweite Spalte (S2), die mit der ersten Spalte (S1) verbunden ist. Zur Abfuhr von aus der Hochdruckbohrung (H) über die erste Spalte (S1) in die zweite Spalte (S2) getretenem Kraftstoff grenzt die Rücklaufleitung (R) an die zweite Spalte (S2) an. Der Kraftstoffinjektor ist dergestalt, dass die zweite Spalte (S2) zur Umgebung des Kraftstoffinjektors hin abgedichtet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 55/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 55/002 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 0060233 A1 20001012 - SIEMENS AG [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255039 A2 20021106; EP 1255039 A3 20040526; EP 1255039 B1 20100825; DE 10121531 A1 20021114; DE 50214604 D1 20101007; US 2002162905 A1 20021107; US 6719221 B2 20040413

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110416

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110416

2011-09-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50214604

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100825

2010-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214604 P 20101007

2010-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLUEGL, WENDELIN

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEWENTZ, GUENTER

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMUTZLER, GERD

2010-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOIGT, ANDREAS

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-12-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLUEGL, WENDELIN

2004-12-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEWENTZ, GUENTER

2004-12-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMUTZLER, GERD

2004-12-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOIGT, ANDREAS

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI