Global Patent Index - EP 1255043 A2

EP 1255043 A2 2002-11-06 - Inertia driven turbine or pump

Title (en)

Inertia driven turbine or pump

Title (de)

Maschine, begründet auf Rotorträgheitskräften, betrieben als Turbine oder als Pumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe ou turbine entrainée par l'inertie

Publication

EP 1255043 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02076626 A

Priority

IT BZ20010024 A

Abstract (en)

Machine operating as a turbine or pump comprises a mechanism consisting of a crankshaft, a crank and a connecting rod to oscillate a rotor (R1), a self-closing pipe fixed to the rotor and connected to an inlet (SA) and an outlet (SB), and valves controlled by the mechanism. Preferred Features: The opening and closing mechanism of the valves comprises a shaft parallel to the rotor and having a side toothed arrangement, a plate fixed to the shaft for opening and closing the valve, and a cylindrical segment fixed to a supporting frame.

Abstract (de)

Die zur Ausführung der Erfindung erforderlichen Einzelheiten sind: ein Stützrahmen; ein Rotor R1; ein System Koppelstange- Kurbel oder ein gleichwertiges System um die Schwingbewegung der zweiphasigen Schaltung zu erzeugen (C.B.), bestehend aus einem Rohr, dessen Achse gemäß einer auf einer zur Drehachse des Rotors senkrechten Ebene angeordneten Kreislinie gekrümmt ist. In einer zur genannten Kreislinie senkrechten Stellung ist der Eingangs- und Ausgangsübergang der C.B. angeordnet. Rechts und links zum genannten Übergang ist in der Rohrschaltung ein Ventil eingebaut, dessen Öffnen und Schließen durch einen Mechanismus gesteuert wird. Die Öffnung des Ventils erlaubt den Durchgang der Flüssigkeit im rechtsgängigen und linksgängigen Sinn. Jeder Übergang ist mit einem Schlauch am entsprechenden, am Stützrahmen befestigten Eingang und Ausgang verbunden. Bei Ändern der Drehgeschwindigkeit der Kurbelwelle entwickelt die Maschine einen größeren oder kleineren Druck gegenüber jenem, der am Eingang der beiden aktiven Schaltungen angelegt ist. Im ersten Fall wird die Maschine als Pumpe, im zweiten als Turbine betrieben. Das obige ist in der folgenden Figur 1/5 beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 33/00; F04F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 33/00 (2006.01); F04F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 33/00 (2013.01); F04F 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255043 A2 20021106; EP 1255043 A3 20040908; IT BZ20010024 A1 20021030; US 2002172592 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-06-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI