Global Patent Index - EP 1255046 A2

EP 1255046 A2 2002-11-06 - Fluid pressure cylinder, especially for use in the food industry

Title (en)

Fluid pressure cylinder, especially for use in the food industry

Title (de)

Druckmittelzylinder, insbesondere zum Einsatz in der Lebensmittelindustrie

Title (fr)

Vérin, surtout pour l'emploi dans l'industrie alimentaire

Publication

EP 1255046 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009290 A

Priority

DE 10121190 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a cylinder tube (1) closed by a base (4) and top (3) with a piston subjected to pressurized medium on at least one side, a piston rod (2) and at least one sensor (8a,b) for detecting the piston rod position movable mounted on the cylinder tube. At least one axis-parallel closed channel (7) is provided for mounting the sensor in the wall region of the non-magnetic cylinder tube in a sealed manner.

Abstract (de)

Druckmittelzylinder, insbesondere zum Einsatz in der Lebensmittelindustrie, mit einem Zylinderrohr (1), das von einem Zylinderboden (4) sowie einem Zylinderdeckel (3) verschlossen ist und in dem ein Kolben längs verschiebbar untergebracht ist, von dem aus koaxial eine Kolbenstange ausgeht, die den Zylinderdeckel (3) abgedichtet durchdringt, wobei am Zylinderrohr (1) ein Sensor (8) zur Detektion der Kolbenstellung vorgesehen ist, der längs entlang des Zylinderrohres (1) verschiebbar befestigt ist, wobei das mit dem Kolben zusammenwirkende Zylinderrohr (1) von einem separaten Außenrohr (2) umgeben ist, welches mit zumindest einem innerhalb der Wandung längs verlaufenden geschlossenen Kanal (7) zur Unterbringung des Sensors (8) ausgestattet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/28; F15B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/1428 (2013.01); F15B 15/2892 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19716736 A1 19981015 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10152178 A1 20021114; DE 10152178 C2 20030417; EP 1255046 A2 20021106; EP 1255046 A3 20040225; EP 1255046 B1 20050713

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50203605

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203605 P 20050818

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2005-07-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050713

2004-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI