Global Patent Index - EP 1255072 A2

EP 1255072 A2 2002-11-06 - Water-tight tubular lamp

Title (en)

Water-tight tubular lamp

Title (de)

Wasserdichte rohrförmige Leuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire tubulaire et étanche à l'eau

Publication

EP 1255072 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009654 A

Priority

DE 10121613 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a housing tube (3) with two ends that is transparent at least one on one side, closure devices (9,11) applied to the ends via O-ring seals (16) and connected by at least two anchorage rods (21) that press them against the housing tube. Thermal compensation arrangements (36) ensure sealing at all operating temperatures and a bearer to which is attached at least one set of lamp holders for at least one fluorescent lamp.

Abstract (de)

Eine explosionsgeschützte Leuchte (1) weist Rohrform auf. Sie besteht aus einem glasklaren, lichtdurchlässigen Gehäuserohr (3), an dessen einem Ende ein Verschlussstück (2) und am anderen Ende ein Zwischenring (5) sitzen. Das Verschlussstück (2) und der Zwischenring (5) sind mittels O-Ringen gegen die Stirnseite des Gehäuserohrs abgedichtet. Das Verschlussstück (2) und der Zwischenring (5) sind mittels wenigstens zwei Zugankern (21) verbunden. Die Leuchte hat Ausgleichmitteln (36) die eine Differenz der thermischen Längenausdehnungskoeffizienten des Gehäuserohrs (3) und der Zuganker (21) ausgleichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 31/00; F21V 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 25/12 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21V 25/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255072 A2 20021106; EP 1255072 A3 20060104; DE 10121613 A1 20021114; DE 10121613 B4 20090430

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-06-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-01-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI