Global Patent Index - EP 1255077 A2

EP 1255077 A2 2002-11-06 - Device for the combustion of a gaseous mixture of fuel and oxidant

Title (en)

Device for the combustion of a gaseous mixture of fuel and oxidant

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbrennen eines gasförmigen Brennstoff-Oxidator-Gemischs

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la combustion d'un mélange gazeux de combustible et comburant

Publication

EP 1255077 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02405325 A

Priority

  • CH 22982001 A
  • US 28699501 P

Abstract (en)

An arrangement for burning a gaseous fuel-oxidant mixture, especially in power stations, comprises a catalyst turbulence producing unit (2) in which part of the fuel-oxidant mixture is burnt and in which a turbulent flow (6) is produced. The unit contains a catalyst and the channels are angled with respect to the longitudinal central axis.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Verbrennen eines gasförmigen Brennstoff-Oxidator-Gemischs (4), insbesondere für eine Kraftwerksanlage, umfassend eine Katalysator-Drallerzeuger-Anordnung (2), in der ein Teil des Brennstoff-Oxidator-Gemischs (4) verbrennt und die eine Drallströmung (6) erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/40; F23C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/40 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23C 9/00 (2006.01); F23C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 13/00 (2013.01); F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23C 9/006 (2013.01); F23R 3/40 (2013.01); F23C 2900/13002 (2013.01); F23D 2203/107 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255077 A2 20021106; EP 1255077 A3 20040107; EP 1255077 B1 20080611; DE 50212351 D1 20080724; NO 20022034 A 20021031; NO 20022034 D0 20020429; NO 328378 B1 20100208; US 2002197580 A1 20021226; US 6638055 B2 20031028

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120423

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50212351

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120422

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120422

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110406

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090312

2008-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212351 P 20080724

2008-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2008-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23R 3/40 20060101AFI20080211BHEP

2008-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23C 13/00 20060101ALI20080211BHEP

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051124

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI