Global Patent Index - EP 1255078 A1

EP 1255078 A1 2002-11-06 - Catalyst

Title (en)

Catalyst

Title (de)

Katalysator

Title (fr)

Catalyseur

Publication

EP 1255078 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405326 A

Priority

  • CH 22992001 A
  • US 28699701 P

Abstract (en)

A catalyst for the combustion of a gaseous fuel-oxidant mixture that flows through it comprises numerous catalytically active channels (8, 8a) and catalytically inactive channels (8, 8i). The catalyst has at least two sectors in the main flow direction, which are arranged so that the inlet sector offers less flow resistance than the subsequent sector(s).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Katalysator (5) zum Verbrennen eines Teils eines den Katalysator durchströmenden, gasförmigen Brennstoff-Oxidator-Gemischs, insbesondere für einen Brenner einer Kraftwerksanlage. Der Katalysator (5) weist mehrere katalytisch aktive Kanäle (8a) und mehrere katalytisch inaktive Kanäle (8i) auf. Der Katalysator (5) besitzt wenigstens zwei Sektoren (I bis IV), die in der Hauptdurchströmungsrichtung (9) hintereinander angeordnet sind. Ein Einlaßsektor (I) weist die Anströmseite (6) des Katalysators (5) auf und besitzt insbesondere einen kleineren Durchströmungswiderstand als der unmittelbar nachfolgende Sektor (II) oder als jeder der nachfolgenden Sektoren (II, III, IV). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/40; F23C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 13/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 13/00 (2013.01); F23R 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255078 A1 20021106; NO 20022035 A 20021031; NO 20022035 D0 20020429; NO 328539 B1 20100315; US 2002182555 A1 20021205; US 2007128093 A1 20070607; US 7182920 B2 20070227; US 7934925 B2 20110503

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160628

2016-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI