Global Patent Index - EP 1255080 A1

EP 1255080 A1 2002-11-06 - Catalytic burner

Title (en)

Catalytic burner

Title (de)

Katalytischer Brenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur catalytique

Publication

EP 1255080 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405340 A

Priority

US 28699601 P

Abstract (en)

A catalyzer (5) is arranged in an annular duct (4) that leads to a combustor (2) in which a recirculation zone (29) is formed. A swirl generator (6) arranged in the annular duct downstream of the catalyzer, subjects a flow through the catalyzer to swirl.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen katalytischen Brenner (1) einer Brennkammer (2), insbesondere einer Kraftwerksanlage, umfassend einen zur Brennkammer (2) führenden Ringkanal (4), einen im Ringkanal (4) angeordneten Katalysator (5), eine Primär-Einspritzeinrichtung (7) zum Einspritzen eines Brennstoffs in den Ringkanal (4) stromauf des Katalysators (5), eine Sekundär-Einspritzeinrichtung (3) zum direkten Einspritzen eines Brennstoffs in die Brennkammer (2). Um in der Brennkammer (2) eine Rezirkulationszone (29) zu stabilisieren, ist eine Drallerzeugungseinrichtung (6) vorgesehen, die stromab des Katalysators (5) im Ringkanal (4) angeordnet ist und eine den Katalysator (5) durchströmende Strömung mit einem Drall beaufschlagt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/40; F23D 14/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01); F23R 3/36 (2006.01); F23R 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/36 (2013.01); F23R 3/286 (2013.01); F23R 3/34 (2013.01); F23R 3/346 (2013.01); F23R 3/40 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00008 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14004 (2013.01); F23N 2037/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0694740 A2 19960131 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]
  • [A] EP 0710797 A2 19960508 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 135 (M - 585) 28 April 1987 (1987-04-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 435 (M - 1655) 15 August 1994 (1994-08-15)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

US 2002160330 A1 20021031; US 6609905 B2 20030826; DE 50212720 D1 20081016; EP 1255080 A1 20021106; EP 1255080 B1 20080903

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 50212720

2017-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50212720

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2017-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170727 AND 20170802

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 50212720

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 50212720

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50212720

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2009-08-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090604

2008-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212720 P 20081016

2008-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI