Global Patent Index - EP 1255081 A2

EP 1255081 A2 2002-11-06 - Atmospheric gas burner of radiant type

Title (en)

Atmospheric gas burner of radiant type

Title (de)

Atmosphärischer Strahlungsgasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur radiant à gaz de type atmosphérique

Publication

EP 1255081 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02007379 A

Priority

IT MI20010247 U

Abstract (en)

A burner of radiant atmospheric type, comprising a porous ceramic element, positioned to close a chamber (11, 11A) into which a gas/air mixture is fed, there being provided at least a second chamber (12, 12A) adjacent to the first, both being closed by the porous ceramic element (5, 6; 5A, 6A)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255081 A2 20021106; EP 1255081 A3 20061122; EP 1255081 B1 20081119; DE 60229897 D1 20090102; ES 2317960 T3 20090501; IT MI20010247 U1 20021104; IT MI20010247 V0 20010503; US 2002164553 A1 20021107

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170410

2018-06-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180629

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170409

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170409

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171103

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170409

2017-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60229897

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160406

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2317960 T3

2009-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60229897 P 20090102

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070920

2007-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI