Global Patent Index - EP 1255085 A2

EP 1255085 A2 2002-11-06 - Heat exchanger having multiple coils and method for making the heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger having multiple coils and method for making the heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit mehreren Heizwicklungen und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Wärmetauschers

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur avec plusieurs enroulements et méthode pour fabriquer l'échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1255085 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009720 A

Priority

DE 10121805 A

Abstract (en)

Heat exchanger comprises several heating coils (2, 3) formed by spiral heating tube windings and arranged coaxially to each other a radial distance apart to form an inner chamber (13) into which a burner head and/or its heating flame/hot gases extend. The windings of the radially outer heating coil (3) are at least partly arranged in a radially offset chicane-type manner to form additional flow channels (23) through which the hot gases can additionally flow. An Independent claim is also included for a process for manufacturing the above heat exchanger. Preferred Features: The windings of the radially outer heating coil and/or the radially inner heating coil (2) are arranged above one another in the axial direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wärmetauscher mit mehreren Heizwicklungen und ein Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses Wärmetauschers, welcher insbesondere für die Heißwasserbereitung für Hochdruckreiniger eingesetzt wird. Die Heizwicklungen sind aus spiralförmig gewundenen Heizrohrwindungen gebildet und zueinander im wesentlichen koaxial angeordnet und radial voneinander beabstandet, und bilden einen Innenraum, in welchen ein Brennerkopf und/oder dessen Heizflamme bzw. die verbrennenden Heizgase hineinreicht, wobei die Heizgase eine Strömungsumlenkung an einern dem Brennerkopf gegenüber liegenden Prallelement erfährt, auf Grund dessen die Heizgase dann in mindestens einem Strömungskanal zwischen den Heizwicklungen hindurchströmt. Kennzeichnend hierbei ist, dass die Windungen der radial äußeren Heizwicklung mindestens teilweise derart schikanenartig radial zueinander versetzt angeordnet sind, dass zusätzliche Strömungskanäle zwischen den Windungen der radial äußeren Heizwicklung gebildet sind, durch welche die Heizgase zusätzlich hindurchströmen können, wodurch die Kontaktzeit verlängert wird. Durch den erfindungsgemäßen Wärmetauscher werden höhere Wärmeausnutzungsgrade erzielt, wie beim Stand der Technik. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/16 (2006.01); F28D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/024 (2013.01); F24H 1/165 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0971194 A2 20000112 - WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255085 A2 20021106; EP 1255085 A3 20031008; EP 1255085 B1 20060405; AT 322656 T 20060415; DE 10121805 A1 20021107; DE 50206278 D1 20060518; DK 1255085 T3 20060807

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-12-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALTO DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080409

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060706

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070108

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-15 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-09-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060905

2006-08-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-07-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060716

2006-07-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206278 P 20060518

2006-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060414

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-04-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-04-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI