Global Patent Index - EP 1255165 A2

EP 1255165 A2 2002-11-06 - Coating system and system for producing photoconductive elements for electrophotography

Title (en)

Coating system and system for producing photoconductive elements for electrophotography

Title (de)

Beschichtungssystem und Verfahren zur Herstellung photoleitfähiger Elemente für Elektrophotographie

Title (fr)

Système de revêtement, ainsi que système de production d' éléments photoconducteurs pour électrophotographie

Publication

EP 1255165 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02009305 A

Priority

JP 2001133768 A

Abstract (en)

A coating system of the present invention includes a bath storing a coating liquid for coating conductive cores. An end processing device removes films formed on the end faces of the cores coated with the coating liquid. At least two elevation devices are mounted on a single rotatable shaft each for gripping the cores and selectively raising or lowering the cores. Cores to be coated and cores to be processed by the end processing device are replaced in position with each other to thereby effect coating and end face processing in parallel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/05; B05D 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/09 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01); B05C 13/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/18 (2006.01); G03G 5/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/0525 (2013.01); B05C 3/09 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255165 A2 20021106; EP 1255165 A3 20030129; EP 1255165 B1 20080312; DE 60225501 D1 20080424; DE 60225501 T2 20090423; JP 2002326047 A 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60225501 P 20080424

2008-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070207

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03G 5/05 A, 7B 05D 1/18 B, 7B 05C 3/09 B

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI