Global Patent Index - EP 1255237 A2

EP 1255237 A2 2002-11-06 - Device for receiving advertising means

Title (en)

Device for receiving advertising means

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Aufnehmen von Werbemitteln

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la réception de moyens publicitaires

Publication

EP 1255237 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006772 A

Priority

DE 20107436 U

Abstract (en)

The advertising display (3) support (1) has a rotary carrier (2) having at least two sides on which the advertising material is mounted. The carrier can have strip shaped display surfaces attached to it. The carrier can have guide rails (7) having grooves to receive the edges of the strip shaped display surfaces. The guide rails can be removably attached to the carriers. The advertising carrying surfaces of the strips can have raised ribs (43).

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung(1) zum Aufnehmen von Werbemitteln(3), mit einem drehbar gelagerten Trägerelement(2,32,52), mit wenigstens zwei Seiten, die mit Werbemitteln(3) bestückbar sind, wobei die Werbemittel(3) streifenförmig ausgebildet und an den Seiten des Trägerelementes(2,32,52) befestigt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/025 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • FR 1390194 A 19650226 - ULTRAVISION ETS
  • EP 0526248 B1 19970319 - POWERGRAPHIC DISPLAYS LTD [GB]
  • Brochure of SCHULER WERBESYSTEME
  • Brochure of DISPLAY WERBUNG
  • "Verified print out of Internet archive relating to TRIAD display system", XP002947662, [retrieved on 20030311]
  • Brochure of ACTION GRAPHIX Inc.
  • "Print out of Internet archive relating to ACTION GRAPHIX slip-in system", XP002947664, [retrieved on 20030311]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107436 U1 20010809; EP 1255237 A2 20021106; EP 1255237 A3 20030521

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060912

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHULERMEDIA GMBH

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHULERMEDIA GMBH

2005-10-26 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20041013

2005-10-26 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-10-19 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: SCHULER, REINHARDT MICHAEL

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHULER, REINHARDT MICHAEL

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031119

- Countries: LT

2004-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031119

- Countries: SI

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI