Global Patent Index - EP 1255239 A1

EP 1255239 A1 2002-11-06 - Compensation method for improving the image quality of a plasma display panel

Title (en)

Compensation method for improving the image quality of a plasma display panel

Title (de)

Ausgleichsverfahren zur Verbesserung der Bildqualität einer Plasmaanzeigetafel

Title (fr)

Procédé de compensation pour améliorer la qualité d'image d'un panneau d'affichage à plasma

Publication

EP 1255239 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01110882 A

Priority

EP 01110882 A

Abstract (en)

A compensation process for improving color saturation and image quality of a plasma display panel (PDP) comprises the steps of a) calculating the brightness of a visible light generated by environment light on PDP through performing a numeric operation according to a color mixing theory, and the corresponding light ought to be generated by each of red, green, and blue discharge cells of each of a plurality of pixels on the PDP sufficient to exclude the visible light generated by environment light on PDP; b) increasing or decreasing strength of input image signals of each of said red, green, and blue discharge cells in accordance with the result of calculation; and c) generating light from each of said red, green, and blue discharge cells to eliminate said visible light from causing an adverse effect on said PDP. This can reduce manufacturing cost without modifying the construction of PDP or performing an additional processing thereon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/08 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2003 (2013.01); G09G 3/08 (2013.01); G09G 3/288 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0242 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0271 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0666 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255239 A1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120329

2008-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071122

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI