Global Patent Index - EP 1255267 A1

EP 1255267 A1 2002-11-06 - Relay for telecommunications network configuration

Title (en)

Relay for telecommunications network configuration

Title (de)

Relais für Telekommunikationsconfiguration

Title (fr)

Relais pour configuration de réseau de télécommunication

Publication

EP 1255267 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02291094 A

Priority

  • AU PR475301 A
  • AU PR580501 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to the structure of a magnetic relay for telecommunication network configuration, said relay having a magnetically cantilevered armature, said contact armature having a section with reduced cross section over a part of its length to provide a hinge action. While the invention is suitable for use in miniaturized relays, it can also be used with larger relays. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/005 (2013.01); H01H 50/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 6094116 A 20000725 - TAI YU-CHONG [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255267 A1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL LUCENT

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030506

- Countries: AL

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030506

- Countries: LT

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030506

- Countries: LV

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030506

- Countries: MK

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030506

- Countries: RO

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030506

- Countries: SI

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI