Global Patent Index - EP 1255273 A2

EP 1255273 A2 2002-11-06 - Electric lamp

Title (en)

Electric lamp

Title (de)

Elektrische Lampe

Title (fr)

Lampe électrique

Publication

EP 1255273 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004560 A

Priority

DE 10121608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2384484A1] The invention relates to an electric lamp, in particular a motor vehicle auxiliary light lamp, and a method for producing such a lamp. The base of the lamp comprises an annular metal part (5) of resilient design for holding the lamp vessel (1), and a plastic part (6) provided with at least one hollow contact pin (7, 8). A supply lead (3, 4) projecting from the lamp vessel (1) is threaded into the hollow contact pin (7, 8) and welded to the latter such that the metal part (5) is under mechanical stress. In this way, backlash-free plug-and-socket connections are produced between the lamp vessel (1) and the metal part (5) or between the metal part (5) and the plastic part (6).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Lampe, insbesondere eine Kraftfahrzeug-Hilfslichtlampe und ein Herstellungsverfahren für eine derartige Lampe. Der Sockel der Lampe besteht aus einem ringförmigen, federnd ausgebildeten Metallteil (5) zur Halterung des Lampengefäßes (1) und aus einem mit mindestens einem hohlen Kontaktstift (7, 8) versehenen Kunststoffteil (6). Eine aus dem Lampengefäß (1) herausragende Stromzuführung (3, 4) ist in den hohlen Kontaktstift (7, 8) eingefädelt und mit diesem verschweißt, so dass das Metallteil (5) unter mechanischer Spannung steht. Auf diese Weise werden spielfreie Steckverbindungen zwischen dem Lampengefäß (1) und dem Metallteil (5) bzw. zwischen dem Metallteil (5) und dem Kunststoffteil (6) erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 5/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); H01J 5/54 (2006.01); B60Q 1/00 (2006.01); H01J 5/56 (2006.01); H01J 5/58 (2006.01); H01J 5/62 (2006.01); H01J 9/34 (2006.01); H01J 13/46 (2006.01); H01K 1/18 (2006.01); H01K 1/42 (2006.01); H01K 1/46 (2006.01); H01K 3/16 (2006.01); H05B 33/02 (2006.01); F21W 101/12 (2006.01); F21W 101/14 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/34 (2013.01); H01K 1/46 (2013.01); H01K 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255273 A2 20021106; EP 1255273 A3 20060215; CA 2384484 A1 20021104; DE 10121608 A1 20021107; JP 2002343309 A 20021129; US 2002163288 A1 20021107; US 6628081 B2 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-31 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070920

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060306

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 5/54 20060101AFI20051228BHEP

2006-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 5/56 20060101ALI20051228BHEP

2006-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 5/58 20060101ALI20051228BHEP

2006-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 5/62 20060101ALI20051228BHEP

2006-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01K 1/46 20060101ALI20051228BHEP

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI