Global Patent Index - EP 1255274 A2

EP 1255274 A2 2002-11-06 - Method of fabricating an impregnated cathode for a cathode ray tube

Title (en)

Method of fabricating an impregnated cathode for a cathode ray tube

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorratskathode für eine Kathodenstrahlröhre

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une cathode imprégnée pour tube à rayons cathodiques

Publication

EP 1255274 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02100425 A

Priority

DE 10121445 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a storage cathode comprises using a cathode support with a cathode base made from a cathode metal and a metal matrix body made from a matrix of metal particles. Production of a storage cathode comprises using a cathode support with a cathode base made from a cathode metal and a metal matrix body made from a matrix of metal particles. The matrix of metal particles is made of a metal selected from refractory group metals and oxide particles of calcium, strontium or barium infiltrated into the matrix. The matrix is produced by reducing a porous stabilized oxide gel of the metal.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorratskathode für eine Kathodenstrahlröhre, die einen Kathodenträger mit einer Kathodenbasis aus einem Kathodenmetall und einen Metallmatrixkörper aus einer Matrix von Metallpartikeln eines Metall ausgewählt aus der Gruppe der Refraktärmetalle und in die Matrix infiltrierte Oxidpartikeln eines Erdalkalioxids, ausgewählt aus der Gruppe der Oxide des Calciums, Strontiums und Bariums, umfasst, wobei die Matrix von Metallpartikel eines Metalls ausgewählt aus der Gruppe der Refraktärmetalle durch Reduktion eines porösen, stabilisierten Oxidgels des Metalls, ausgewählt aus der Gruppe der Refraktärmetalle, hergestellt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/04 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255274 A2 20021106; DE 10121445 A1 20021107; JP 2003016931 A 20030117; US 2002193041 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2004-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GAERTNER, GEORG,C/O PHILIPS CORP.INTELL.PROP.

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOODHAND, CHRIS,C/O PHILIPS CORP.INTELL.PROP.

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HODGSON, SIMON,C/O PHILIPS CORP.INTELL.PROP.

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAKER, ANDREW,C/O PHILIPS CORP.INTELL.PROP.

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI