Global Patent Index - EP 1255325 A1

EP 1255325 A1 2002-11-06 - Female electrical terminal

Title (en)

Female electrical terminal

Title (de)

Elektrischer Buchsenkontakt

Title (fr)

Contact électrique femelle

Publication

EP 1255325 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02076493 A

Priority

GB 0110767 A

Abstract (en)

A female electrical terminal (10) for mating with a flat blade contact (12) comprising first and second arms (14,16) positionable on one side (22) of the flat blade contact and extending in the mating direction (X); and third and fourth arms (18,20) positionable on the other side (24) of the flat blade contact and extending in the mating direction; wherein the first arm and the second arm are pivotally mounted at one end (26,28) on a first pivot axis (A); wherein the first and second arms have a free end (30,32) opposed to said one end; wherein the third arm and the fourth arm are pivotally mounted at one end (34,36) on a second pivot axis (B); wherein the third and fourth arms have a free end (38,40) opposed to said one end; wherein the first arm is positioned opposed to said fourth arm; wherein the second arm is positioned opposed to said third arm; wherein each arm has a contact area (42-48) formed adjacent the free end thereof directed towards the opposed arm; wherein the first and third arms have a first predetermined length (L1) between said one end and said free end thereof; wherein the second and fourth arms have a second predetermined length (L2) between said one end and said free end thereof, the second length being greater than said first length; wherein the contact areas of the first and third arms are substantially aligned, on a first plane (P1) extending substantially perpendicular to the mating direction; and wherein the contact areas of the second and fourth arms are substantially aligned on a second plane (P2) which is substantially parallel to and offset from the first plane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255325 A1 20021106; GB 0110767 D0 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061006

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI