Global Patent Index - EP 1255327 A1

EP 1255327 A1 2002-11-06 - Coaxial electrical connector element

Title (en)

Coaxial electrical connector element

Title (de)

Element eines elektrischen Koaxialsteckverbinders

Title (fr)

Elément de connecteur électrique coaxial

Publication

EP 1255327 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291129 A

Priority

FR 0106008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002164901A1] The present invention relates to a coaxial electrical connector element for providing electrical connection between at least one contact element and a main printed circuit card, each contact element(s) comprising a central conductor and an outer conductor, the connector element comprising a support element suitable for receiving the contact element(s) and an intermediate printed circuit card carrying conductor tracks enabling the central conductor(s) to be connected electrically to conductor tracks of the main printed circuit card. In the connector element, the intermediate printed circuit card has an end face presenting at least one projecting portion, one of the conductor tracks of the intermediate printed circuit card extending over said projecting portion and coming into contact with a conductor track of the main printed circuit card.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention est relative à un élément de connecteur électrique coaxial (1) destiné à assurer la connexion électrique d'au moins un élément de contact (3) à une carte de circuit imprimé principale, le ou lesdits éléments de contact (3) comportant chacun un conducteur central et un conducteur externe, l'élément de connecteur comportant un élément de support (2) apte à recevoir le ou les éléments de contact et une carte de circuit imprimé intermédiaire comportant des pistes conductrices permettant de relier électriquement le ou les conducteurs centraux à des pistes conductrices de la carte de circuit imprimé principale. Cet élément de connecteur est caractérisé par le fait que la carte de circuit imprimé intermédiaire (4) comporte une tranche (45) présentant au moins une portion en saillie (46), l'une des pistes conductrices de la carte de circuit imprimé intermédiaire s'étendant sur cette portion en saillie et venant au contact avec une piste conductrice de la carte de circuit imprimé principale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01R 12/721 (2013.01); H01R 13/6599 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255327 A1 20021106; CN 1284280 C 20061108; CN 1384565 A 20021211; DE 1255327 T1 20030528; FR 2824426 A1 20021108; FR 2824426 B1 20060825; TW 554591 B 20030921; US 2002164901 A1 20021107; US 7029324 B2 20060418

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110621

2010-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100726

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-05-28 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-01-29 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI