Global Patent Index - EP 1255339 A1

EP 1255339 A1 2002-11-06 - Boltless wedge clamp

Title (en)

Boltless wedge clamp

Title (de)

Schraubenlose Keilspannklemme

Title (fr)

Pince d'ancrage à cale sans vis

Publication

EP 1255339 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01110907 A

Priority

EP 01110907 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a two-part longitudinally divided clamp body (1) with a key chamber formed by clamp body halves of identical geometry and a two-part cable holder (4) with a key shape matching the key chamber contour that is inserted into the clamp body with the conductor. One cable holder part is extended and curved in the cable outlet. The cable is held in contact with the extended part in the outlet by a holding element.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Keilabspannklemme zum Abspannen von Aluminium-, Aldrey-, Aluminium-Stahl und Aldrey-Stahl-Seilen, die ohne Schraubverbindungen auskommt und in Abspannketten für Mittel- und Hochspannungsfreileitungen eingesetzt werden kann. Nach der Konzeption der Erfindung sind die Klemmenkörperhälften (1.1, 1.2) zur Bildung einer Keilkammer (1.3) ohne Hinterschneidungsflächen so ausgeführt, dass die Klemmenkörperhälften (1.1, 1.2) jeweils einen U-förmigen Querschnitt aufweisen, mit den Enden ihrer Seitenschenkel aufeinander bzw. sich gegenüber stehen und zur Verbindung der beiden Klemmenkörperhälften die aus dem U-Profil herauskragenden Seitenschenkelstege (1.7) so ausgebildet sind, dass sie sich ineinander verhaken können. Die vom U-Profil der Klemmenkörperhälften (1.1, 1.2) herauskragenden Seitenschenkelstege (1.7) bilden die Eingriffselemente (1.4) und sind paarweise als Falle (1.5) und Klinke (1.6) ausgeführt. Dabei ist die Falle (1.5) in einen Steg eingebracht, der sich nach außen ­ vom U-Profil abgekröpft wegführend ­ in Verlängerung des betreffenden U-Schenkels erstreckt. Die Klinke (1.6) steht als verkürzter Steg rechtwinklig vom jeweils anderen U-Schenkelende ab. Die Öffnung der Falle hat die Maße des Klinkenquerschnitts und nimmt im Zuge des Verbindungsvorganges der Klemmenkörperhälften (1.1, 1.2) die Klinke (1.6) auf. Nach diesem beschriebenen Aufbau sind die Eingriffselemente Falle (1.5) und Klinke (1.6) so angeordnet, dass sie unter Bildung der geschlossenen Keilkammer (1.3) ineinander geschoben und nach Einführung des Keilabschnitts der Seilaufnahme (4) nicht mehr getrennt werden können. Die mit diesem Aufbau ausgeführten Klemmenkörperhälften werden als Schmiedeteile vorzugsweise aus einer Al-Knetlegierung hergestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02G 7/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02G 7/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02G 7/056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1255339 A1 20021106; EP 1255339 B1 20061011; AT 342601 T 20061115; DE 50111195 D1 20061123; ES 2274835 T3 20070601; HR P20020371 A2 20021231; PL 353691 A1 20021118; SK 284466 B6 20050401; SK 6232002 A3 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140505

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111195

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140505

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140505

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 342601 T

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111195

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080506

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2274835 T3

2007-05-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070117

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111195 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI