Global Patent Index - EP 1255460 A1

EP 1255460 A1 2002-11-13 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE FILLING ABILITY OF TOBACCO

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE FILLING ABILITY OF TOBACCO

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FÜLLFÄHIGKEIT VON TABAK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LE POUVOIR DE REMPLISSAGE DE TABAC

Publication

EP 1255460 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01902411 A

Priority

  • DE 10006424 A
  • EP 0101227 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158295A1] The invention relates to a method for improving the filling ability of tobacco, such as cut tobacco leaves, or ribs, or plant tobacco additives with a cell structure, whereby the tobacco material, with an initial water content of 8 to 16 wt %, is treated with a gas, comprising nitrogen and/or argon at pressures from 50 to 1000 bar, either in an autoclave, or in a cascade-like series of several autoclaves and, finally, after completion of a decompression, a thermal after-treatment. The invention is characterised in that the decompression is carried out with at least one holding stage, the pressure of which corresponds to 3 to 60 %, preferably, 3 to 30 % of the original maximum pressure and that the heating of the system under residual pressure is carried out, such that the temperature of the tobacco on withdrawal after the complete release of pressure is in the range 10 to 80 DEG C. The elevation of temperature of the system under residual pressure is effected by a holding stage, a circulation over a heat exchanger and/or passing hot gas over the system, whereby the release of pressure from the maximum pressure to the pressure of the holding stage occurs over a period of 20 seconds to 5 minutes and the release of the residual pressure occurs over a period of 3 seconds to 3 minutes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24B 3/12 (2006.01); A24B 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24B 3/182 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158295A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158295 A1 20010816; WO 0158295 A8 20010920; AR 034404 A1 20040225; AT 300198 T 20050815; AU 3024801 A 20010820; BG 107104 A 20030530; BR 0108338 A 20030311; CA 2400068 A1 20010816; CN 1400873 A 20030305; CZ 20023080 A3 20030514; DE 10006424 A1 20010823; DE 10006424 C2 20030123; EA 003544 B1 20030626; EA 200200855 A1 20021226; EE 200200447 A 20031215; EP 1255460 A1 20021113; EP 1255460 B1 20050727; ES 2243436 T3 20051201; HU 0204445 A2 20030428; IL 150791 D0 20030212; JP 2003525036 A 20030826; MX PA02007848 A 20040910; NO 20023781 A 20020809; NO 20023781 D0 20020809; PL 194440 B1 20070531; PL 357092 A1 20040712; SK 13312002 A3 20030109; UA 72315 C2 20030415; US 2003075191 A1 20030424

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-02-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060205

2006-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-12-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243436 T3

2005-10-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-10-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-10-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106887 P 20050901

2005-08-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-08-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-06-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040305

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020726;LT PAYMENT 20020726;LV PAYMENT 20020726;MK PAYMENT 20020726;RO PAYMENT 20020726;SI PAYMENT 20020726