Global Patent Index - EP 1255481 A1

EP 1255481 A1 2002-11-13 - DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A SOAP OR FOAM DISPENSER

Title (en)

DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A SOAP OR FOAM DISPENSER

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSMECHANISMUS FÜR EINEN SEIFEN- ODER SCHAUMSPENDER

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE SAVON OU DE MOUSSE

Publication

EP 1255481 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00900207 A

Priority

CH 0000028 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0152708A1] The invention relates to electrically driven soap and/or foam dispensers, which detect a hand for soaping, by means of a sensor, which switches off the drive using an electronic circuit, when the hand is withdrawn and/or is not in the correct position at the soap outlet. According to the invention, in order to avoid costly and energy demanding circuit arrangements, the drive for a piston (25) is achieved by means of a crank mechanism (9), which drives a piston rod (43) by means of a connecting link (15). Should it be determined that the drive is to be switched off, then the connecting link (15) is retracted by a solenoid (37), which releases the drive. The reset mechanisms provided in the soap or foam dispenser, drive the piston (25) back, such that the escape of soap or foam is stopped. The restarting of the drive is achieved by means of an automatic reengagement of a locking lever (17) which is spring-loaded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/12; A47K 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/12 (2006.01); A47K 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/1209 (2013.01); A47K 5/1217 (2013.01); A47K 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0152708A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0152708 A1 20010726; AT 359016 T 20070515; AU 1961700 A 20010731; DE 50014250 D1 20070524; DK 1255481 T3 20070730; EP 1255481 A1 20021113; EP 1255481 B1 20070411; US 2003006246 A1 20030109; US 6568561 B2 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HTS INTERNATIONAL TRADING AG

- Free text: HTS INTERNATIONAL TRADING AG#NEUHOFSTRASSE 21#6340 BAAR (CH) -TRANSFER TO- HTS INTERNATIONAL TRADING AG#NEUHOFSTRASSE 21#6340 BAAR (CH)

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080119

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-08-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070712

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-09-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070911

2007-07-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-07-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070704

2007-07-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070722

2007-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014250 P 20070524

2007-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI