Global Patent Index - EP 1255563 A1

EP 1255563 A1 2002-11-13 - COMPOSITION OF ANTIGEN AND GLYCOLIPID ADJUVANT SUBLINGUAL ADMINISTRATION

Title (en)

COMPOSITION OF ANTIGEN AND GLYCOLIPID ADJUVANT SUBLINGUAL ADMINISTRATION

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS ANTIGEN UND GLYKOLIPID ZUR SUBLINGUALEN VERABREICHUNG

Title (fr)

ADMINISTRATION SUBLINGUALE D'UNE COMPOSITION CONTENANT DES ANTIGENES ET UN ADJUVANT GLYCOLIPIDIQUE

Publication

EP 1255563 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01942305 A

Priority

  • GB 0100142 W
  • GB 0000891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151082A1] A method of producing a mucosal and systemic immune response in a mammal comprising administering sublingually an effective amount of a composition comprising at least one antigen and a glycolipid adjuvant to said mammal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/39; A61K 31/7088; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/02; A61K 39/12; A61K 39/35; A61K 39/395; A61P 31/00; A61P 35/00; A61P 37/00; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/06 (2006.01); A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/12 (2006.01); A61K 39/35 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/35 (2013.01); A61K 39/39 (2013.01); A61K 2039/53 (2013.01); A61K 2039/542 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55572 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151082A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

MK SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151082 A1 20010719; AR 027924 A1 20030416; AU 2862501 A 20010724; CA 2397359 A1 20010719; CA 2397359 C 20120605; CZ 20022417 A3 20030312; CZ 304941 B6 20150204; DE 60139305 D1 20090903; DK 2100616 T3 20160208; EP 1255563 A1 20021113; EP 1255563 B1 20090722; EP 1255563 B2 20160302; EP 2100616 A2 20090916; EP 2100616 A3 20090923; EP 2100616 B1 20151125; EP 2322212 A1 20110518; ES 2328336 T3 20091112; ES 2328336 T5 20160621; ES 2561360 T3 20160225; GB 0000891 D0 20000308; GB 0101035 D0 20010228; GB 2360210 A 20010919; GB 2360210 B 20041215; HU 0203972 A2 20030328; HU 0203972 A3 20110228; HU 230545 B1 20161128; JP 2003519669 A 20030624; JP 4648603 B2 20110309; PL 356963 A1 20040712; SK 10412002 A3 20030502; SK 288411 B6 20161003; US 2003165512 A1 20030904; US 8470331 B2 20130625

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-21 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2328336 T5

- Effective date: 20160621

2016-06-07 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2016-05-25 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2016-03-15 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2016-03-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20160302

2016-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2016-03-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: MK SI

2016-03-02 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60139305

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090722

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100115

2012-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090722

2012-06-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ALK-ABELLO A/S

- Effective date: 20100422

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100115

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-06-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALK-ABELLO A/S

- Effective date: 20100422

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090722

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-02-15 [REG AT UEP] PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: AT 436957 T

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090722

2009-11-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2328336 T3

2009-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2009-10-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-09-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60139305 P 20090903

2009-08-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: MK SI

2009-07-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-05-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLERGY THERAPEUTICS (UK) LIMITED

2009-05-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORIXA CORPORATION

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060925

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK PAYMENT 20020812;RO;SI PAYMENT 20020812