Global Patent Index - EP 1255611 A1

EP 1255611 A1 2002-11-13 - ROTARY MILL

Title (en)

ROTARY MILL

Title (de)

ROTIERENDE MÜHLE

Title (fr)

BROYEUR ROTATIF

Publication

EP 1255611 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00900046 A

Priority

CA 0000002 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0149417A1] A rotary mill for reduction of ore to particles is described. The rotary mill comprises a primary reduction chamber (18), a secondary reduction chamber (20) and an outlet chamber (22). Material entering the primary reduction chamber (18) is deflected by an impact rotor (16), which shatters the material and sends the resulting particles into a plurality of shatter bars (28). The shatter bars (28) further reduce these particles and deflect them back towards the rotor so that the reduced particles encounter newly shattered material, causing further attrition. In addition, the rotary mill includes an exhaust fan (14) arranged to generate an airflow from the primary reduction chamber, through the secondary reduction chamber and into the outlet chamber. This airflow carries the reduced particles into the secondary reduction chamber (20) wherein the particles are thrown against reduction means (32). The reduction means (32) are positioned between the secondary reduction chamber (20) and the outlet chamber (22) such that only particles below a certain size enter the outlet chamber. Material of sufficiently reduced size enters the outlet chamber wherein it is separated into fine particles and heavier particles. Specifically, the heavier particles fall out of the airflow and gather at the base of the outlet chamber until a sufficient weight accumulates to open the balance door (40) which expels the heavy material from the rotary mill.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/09; B02C 13/288

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/09 (2006.01); B02C 13/288 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/09 (2013.01); B02C 13/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0149417A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0149417 A1 20010712; AT 376883 T 20071115; AU 1853300 A 20010716; AU 777743 B2 20041028; CA 2396580 A1 20010712; CA 2396580 C 20080122; DE 60036964 D1 20071213; DE 60036964 T2 20080521; EP 1255611 A1 20021113; EP 1255611 B1 20071031; ES 2295003 T3 20080416

INPADOC legal status


2018-11-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180928

2018-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140106

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140107

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080106

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080201

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080107

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-08-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295003 T3

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036964 P 20071213

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PATENT APPLIED TECHNOLOGY

2007-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WILLIAM G. STEED

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060831

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020805

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI