Global Patent Index - EP 1255621 A1

EP 1255621 A1 2002-11-13 - AUTOCLAVE FOR THE PRECISION CLEANING OF OBJECTS AND USE OF THE AUTOCLAVE

Title (en)

AUTOCLAVE FOR THE PRECISION CLEANING OF OBJECTS AND USE OF THE AUTOCLAVE

Title (de)

AUTOKLAV ZUR PRÄZISIONSREINIGUNG VON STÜCKEN UND VERWENDUNG DES AUTOKLAVS

Title (fr)

AUTOCLAVE POUR LE NETTOYAGE DE PRECISION DE PIECES ET UTILISATION DE CET AUTOCLAVE

Publication

EP 1255621 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01953012 A

Priority

  • CH 3122000 A
  • IB 0100148 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160534A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for the precision cleaning of the surfaces of objects (3) consisting of metal, ceramic or polymer. Said method consists of exposing the objects, which are displaced by a programmed movement, to the solvent effect of a stream of fluid which alternates between a liquid and a supercritical condition. Cavitation is produced by the action of ultrasonic waves that are generated by transducers located (6) in the external region of the cleaning chamber (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 7/00; B08B 3/06; B08B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/06 (2006.01); B08B 3/12 (2006.01); B08B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 7/0021 (2013.01); B08B 3/06 (2013.01); B08B 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160534A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160534 A1 20010823; AU 2874401 A 20010827; DE 50107279 D1 20051006; EP 1255621 A1 20021113; EP 1255621 B1 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130206

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50107279

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107279 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2005-01-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AUTOCLAVE FOR THE PRECISION CLEANING OF OBJECTS AND USE OF THE AUTOCLAVE

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR IT LI

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040218

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI