Global Patent Index - EP 1255658 A1

EP 1255658 A1 2002-11-13 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED AND DISTANCE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED AND DISTANCE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GESCHWINDIGKEITS- UND ABSTANDSREGELUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE LA VITESSE D'UN VEHICULE ET DE SA DISTANCE PAR RAPPORT A UN VEHICULE QUI LE PRECEDE

Publication

EP 1255658 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01902372 A

Priority

  • DE 10004527 A
  • EP 0101028 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156825A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling the speed of a motor vehicle and distance of the same from at least one motor vehicle that is driving ahead, according to which at least the speed (v) of the motor vehicle and the distance (a) from the motor vehicle that is driving ahead is determined by means of a detection device comprising a distance sensor, and the driving speed (v) is adapted to a deviation of the detected distance (a) from a specified following distance (as). The aim of the invention is to resolve the technical problem of controlling the speed and the distance of a motor vehicle from at least one motor vehicle that is driving ahead in a simple and, at the same time, reliable manner. To this end, the invention provides that an intervention distance (ai) is determined which is shorter than the range of the distance sensor, and the adaptation of the vehicle speed (v) is carried out at a distance (a) which is shorter than the intervention distance (ai).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60W 30/16 (2013.01); B60K 31/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156825A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0156825 A1 20010809; DE 10004527 A1 20010809; EP 1255658 A1 20021113; EP 1255658 B1 20050615; US 2003132046 A1 20030717; US 6807475 B2 20041019

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106517 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANDREAS, PETER

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUCHATZ, THOMAS

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAEKER, WOLFGANG

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RABBA, HEIKO

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR