Global Patent Index - EP 1255680 A1

EP 1255680 A1 2002-11-13 - CONTAINER COMPRISING A BODY AND A COVER

Title (en)

CONTAINER COMPRISING A BODY AND A COVER

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER MIT KORPUS UND DECKEL

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT COMPRENANT UN CORPS ET UN COUVERCLE

Publication

EP 1255680 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911621 A

Priority

  • DE 10005579 A
  • EP 0101382 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158775A1] The invention relates to a container comprising a drum-like body (1) and a tight cover (2) that fits the same, which protects the contents against contamination during transport and storage, permits a repeated opening and closing without reducing the level of hermeticity, and dispenses of the use of an elastomeric seal as an additional material component. The inventive container is characterized in that the cover (2), at least when in a tensioned state, fits tightly onto the body (1) at at least two interspaced continuous sealing points (4, 5), which encircle the axis of symmetry of the container in an annular manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 45/32; B65D 1/16; B65D 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 45/04 (2006.01); B65D 45/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 45/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158775A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158775 A1 20010816; AU 4060301 A 20010820; CA 2406181 A1 20020809; CN 1197740 C 20050420; CN 1420834 A 20030528; DE 10005579 A1 20010830; EP 1255680 A1 20021113; EP 1255680 B1 20040414; JP 2003522683 A 20030729; RU 2002123876 A 20040210; US 2003116571 A1 20030626; ZA 200207200 B 20030807

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SL PACKAGING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SULO EISENWERK STREUBER & LOHMANN GMBH, 32051 HERFORD, DE

- Document: DE 50101984

2017-10-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50101984

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULO EISENWERK STREUBER & LOHMANN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULO EISENWERK STREUBER & LOHMANN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-04-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101984 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI