Global Patent Index - EP 1255692 A1

EP 1255692 A1 2002-11-13 - METHOD FOR VAPORIZING AND/OR SUPERHEATING A COMBUSTIBLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR VAPORIZING AND/OR SUPERHEATING A COMBUSTIBLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERDAMPFEN UND/ODER ÜBERHITZEN EINES BRENNSTOFFS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE VAPORISATION ET/OU DE SURCHAUFFE D'UN COMBUSTIBLE

Publication

EP 1255692 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00991633 A

Priority

  • DE 10003275 A
  • EP 0013210 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155026A1] A method for vaporizing and/or superheating a combustible/water mixture, wherein the combustible is especially methanol, for supplying a gas generation system (2) belonging to a fuel cell installation (3). The waste-gas from the fuel cell and/or gas generation system is catalytically combusted together with a gas containing oxygen in order to produce the thermal energy required therefore. The combustible is added in a dosed manner to the volume flow from the gas containing oxygen and the waste gases of the fuel cell and/or gas generator system in the direction of flow prior to catalytic combustion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 3/32; B01D 1/30; B01J 8/02; B01J 19/26; H01M 8/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/18 (2006.01); B01B 1/00 (2006.01); B01D 1/00 (2006.01); B01J 8/02 (2006.01); B01J 19/26 (2006.01); C01B 3/32 (2006.01); F23K 5/22 (2006.01); H01M 8/0612 (2016.01); H01M 8/04014 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/26 (2013.01); B01B 1/005 (2013.01); B01D 1/0058 (2013.01); B01J 8/0278 (2013.01); C01B 3/323 (2013.01); H01M 8/0625 (2013.01); B01J 2208/00256 (2013.01); B01J 2208/00274 (2013.01); B01J 2208/00309 (2013.01); B01J 2208/0053 (2013.01); H01M 8/04022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155026A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155026 A1 20010802; DE 10003275 A1 20010809; DE 10003275 B4 20070503; EP 1255692 A1 20021113; JP 2003529896 A 20031007; US 2003059729 A1 20030327; US 6866091 B2 20050315

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100223

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR