Global Patent Index - EP 1255807 A1

EP 1255807 A1 2002-11-13 - DETERGENT PRODUCT

Title (en)

DETERGENT PRODUCT

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELERZEUGNIS

Title (fr)

PRODUIT DETERGENT

Publication

EP 1255807 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00980871 A

Priority

  • EP 00980871 A
  • EP 00870023 A
  • EP 00870124 A
  • US 0032533 W
  • US 0019619 W
  • US 0020255 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160966A1] The present invention relates to a composition in a water-soluble pouch, said pouch comprises at least two compartments, and each compartment contains a different component of said composition, wherein a first compartment contains a first component and said first component comprises a liquid matrix and a source of peracid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/04; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 30/02 (2006.01); B65D 30/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/42 (2006.01); C11D 3/43 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 7/02 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/50 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01); D06L 3/02 (2006.01); D06L 3/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/024 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 3/30 (2013.01); C11D 3/3907 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01); C11D 3/43 (2013.01); C11D 11/0023 (2013.01); C11D 17/0004 (2013.01); C11D 17/042 (2013.01); C11D 17/045 (2013.01); C11D 3/3917 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160966A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160966 A1 20010823; WO 0160966 A8 20030103; AR 028508 A1 20030514; AR 035167 A1 20040505; AT 369417 T 20070815; AU 1807601 A 20010827; AU 3824001 A 20010827; BR 0017112 A 20030114; BR 0017112 B1 20110614; BR 0108441 A 20021217; CA 2396931 A1 20010823; CA 2397241 A1 20010823; CA 2397241 C 20081230; CN 1225537 C 20051102; CN 1401030 A 20030305; CN 1434857 A 20030806; DE 60035902 T2 20080417; EP 1255807 A1 20021113; EP 1255807 B1 20070808; EP 1255887 A2 20021113; ES 2290059 T3 20080216; JP 2004500460 A 20040108; JP 2005507432 A 20050317; JP 2013067802 A 20130418; JP 5000060 B2 20120815; MX PA02008065 A 20030227; MX PA02008067 A 20030227; WO 0161099 A1 20010823; WO 0161099 A8 20020516; WO 0208371 A2 20020131; WO 0208371 A3 20080515

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161129

2017-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-10-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151106

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071129

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2009-07-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1052197

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071129

2008-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080509

2008-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071108

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080108

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2008-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290059 T3

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-10-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070402664

2007-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60035902 P 20070920

2007-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-08-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DASQUE, BRUNO, MATTHIEU

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DAVIDSON, NICOLA, ETHEL

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURCKETT-ST.LAURENT,JAMES,CHARLES,TEOPHILE,ROGER

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DE BUZZACCARINI, FRANCESCO

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DENOME, FRANK, WILLIAM

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI