Global Patent Index - EP 1255830 A2

EP 1255830 A2 2002-11-13 - CBP86, A SPERM SPECIFIC PROTEIN

Title (en)

CBP86, A SPERM SPECIFIC PROTEIN

Title (de)

CBP86, EIN SPERMIEN-SPEZIFISCHES PROTEIN

Title (fr)

CBP86, PROTEINE SPECIFIQUE DU SPERME

Publication

EP 1255830 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01902116 A

Priority

  • US 0101715 W
  • US 17688700 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0153338A2] The present invention relates to acidic (pI 4.0) 86 kDA isoforms of a novel, polymorphic, testis-specific protein designated calcium binding protein 86 (CBP86). This protein is tyrosine phosphorylated during <i>in vitro</i>capacitation and bound calcium<45> on 2-D gels, the latter effect abolished by dephosphorylation with alkaline phosphatase. CBP86 localizes to the principal piece of the human sperm flagellum in association with the fibrous sheath and is the first demonstration of a sperm protein that both oligomerizes and gains calcium binding capacity in a tyrosine phosphorylation dependent manner during capacitation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; C12N 5/10; C12Q 1/02; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4728 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0153338A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0153338 A2 20010726; WO 0153338 A3 20020221; AU 2795001 A 20010731; CA 2397901 A1 20010726; EP 1255830 A2 20021113; JP 2003520589 A 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050412

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040930

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERR, JOHN, C.

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUER, SEN

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MANDAL, ARABINDA

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLKOWICZ, MICHAEL

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAABY-HANSEN, SOREN

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERR, JOHN, C.

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUER, SEN

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MANDAL, ARABINDA

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOLKOWICZ, MICHAEL

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAABY-HANSEN, SOREN

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI