Global Patent Index - EP 1255873 A1

EP 1255873 A1 2002-11-13 - MARAGING TYPE SPRING STEEL

Title (en)

MARAGING TYPE SPRING STEEL

Title (de)

FEDERSTAHL VOM MARAGING-TYP

Title (fr)

ACIER A RESSORTS DE TYPE ACIER VIEILLI THERMIQUEMENT

Publication

EP 1255873 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01901158 A

Priority

  • DE 10001650 A
  • EP 0100498 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0153556A1] The invention relates to a high-strength, age-hardenable, corrosion-resistant maraging type spring steel, which is essentially comprised of 6.0 to 9.0 wt. % of Ni, 11.0 to 15.0 wt. % of Cr, 0.1 to 0.3 wt. % of Ti, 0.2 to 0.3 wt. % of Be and of a remainder consisting of Fe, whose martensite temperature M>S< >/= 130 DEG C and which has a ferrite content c>ferrite< of less than 3 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/50; C21D 6/02; C22C 38/44; C22C 38/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01); C22C 38/52 (2006.01); C21D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/004 (2013.01); C21D 8/0205 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/50 (2013.01); C22C 38/52 (2013.01); C21D 9/02 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01); Y10S 148/909 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0153556A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0153556 A1 20010726; DE 10001650 A1 20010726; DE 50110248 D1 20060803; EP 1255873 A1 20021113; EP 1255873 B1 20060621; EP 1255873 B9 20071010; US 2003091458 A1 20030515; US 6793745 B2 20040921

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140117

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140117

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110248 P 20060803

2006-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR