Global Patent Index - EP 1255881 A2

EP 1255881 A2 2002-11-13 - STRETCH BREAK METHOD AND PRODUCT

Title (en)

STRETCH BREAK METHOD AND PRODUCT

Title (de)

STRECKREISSVERFAHREN UND PRODUKT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET PRODUIT DE RUPTURE PAR ETIRAGE

Publication

EP 1255881 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00938266 A

Priority

  • US 0016231 W
  • US 13909699 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0077283A2] A method for stretch breaking fibers (30) to produce a staple yarn (32) and operating a staple fiber spinning machine that enables the production of a plurality of products of lot size smaller than a large denier tow product. The process includes at least two break zones (34,36) and a consolidation zone (38) downstream from a second break zone to form a staple yarn. The filaments are broken in a second break zone downstream from the first break zone by increasing the speed of the fiber fed into the process.

[origin: WO0077283A2] A method for stretch breaking fibers to produce a staple yarn and operating a staple fiber spinning machine that enables the production of a plurality of products of lot size smaller than a large denier tow product. The process includes at least two break zones and a consolidation zone downstream from a second break zone to form a staple yarn. The filaments are broken in a second break zone downstream from the first break zone by increasing the speed of the fiber fed into the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 7/00 (2006.01); D01G 1/08 (2006.01); D01H 1/115 (2006.01); D01H 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0077283A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0077283 A2 20001221; WO 0077283 A3 20020829; AR 024363 A1 20021002; AU 5333000 A 20010102; BR 0012310 A 20020319; CA 2374110 A1 20001221; CN 100392163 C 20080604; CN 101311396 A 20081126; CN 1561413 A 20050105; DE 60025273 D1 20060202; DE 60025273 T2 20060831; EP 1255881 A2 20021113; EP 1255881 B1 20051228; JP 2003519292 A 20030617; MX PA01012911 A 20020902; TW 507029 B 20021021

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090613

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090613

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090613

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080603

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025273 P 20060202

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-12-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011122

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL