Global Patent Index - EP 1255899 A1

EP 1255899 A1 2002-11-13 - STACKABLE CONSTRUCTION PANEL

Title (en)

STACKABLE CONSTRUCTION PANEL

Title (de)

STAPELBARES BAUPANEEL

Title (fr)

PANNEAU DE CONSTRUCTION SUPERPOSABLES

Publication

EP 1255899 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01951155 A

Priority

  • CA 0100054 W
  • CA 2298170 A
  • CA 2312158 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159227A1] A stackable insulating foam panel which has a top side and a bottom side. Each of the panels has a median row of alternating projections and recesses with a similar complementary shape. The median row is disposed between two coplanar edge surfaces. Each projection of the top side is opposed to a recess of the bottom side whereby the top side and/or the bottom side of the panel can be interconnected with either the top side or the bottom side of a like panel. The present invention also concerns a wall form assembly which comprises opposed foam panels disposed in parallel relationship to make a wall form for receiving a flowable material such as concrete and a plurality of connectors for tying the opposed foam panels together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/8617 (2013.01); E04B 2002/8694 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159227A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159227 A1 20010816; AT 401470 T 20080815; AU 2001228222 B2 20050526; AU 2822201 A 20010820; BR 0108281 A 20021029; BR 0108281 B1 20090811; CA 2312158 A1 20010811; CA 2312158 C 20031104; CN 1153876 C 20040616; CN 1398317 A 20030219; DE 60134833 D1 20080828; DK 1255899 T3 20081110; EP 1255899 A1 20021113; EP 1255899 B1 20080716; JP 2003522861 A 20030729; MX PA02007723 A 20040910; NO 20023745 A 20020903; NO 20023745 D0 20020807; NO 327893 B1 20091012; NZ 520590 A 20040227; PL 206444 B1 20100831; PL 360629 A1 20040920

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090119

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081017

2009-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-06-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090417

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081216

2008-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE S.A.

2008-11-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60134833 P 20080828

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041216

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI