Global Patent Index - EP 1255905 A1

EP 1255905 A1 2002-11-13 - OPERATING DEVICE

Title (en)

OPERATING DEVICE

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1255905 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911532 A

Priority

  • DE 10004257 A
  • EP 0100820 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157350A1] The invention relates to a rotating door drive with a tubular housing, rotatably connected at one end to a fixed point. A motor drive unit is arranged at said end, with a spindle mounted in the housing. A drive member of the motor drive unit is non-positively clipped on the one end of the spindle and drives a drive shaft, rotatably connected to the rotating door frame, which is mounted in the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/622 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/622 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/214 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/426 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0157350A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157350 A1 20010809; AT 285016 T 20050115; AU 4054501 A 20010814; DE 10004257 A1 20010809; DE 10004257 C2 20031106; EP 1255905 A1 20021113; EP 1255905 B1 20041215; ES 2231453 T3 20050516; PT 1255905 E 20050228

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140126

2015-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104836

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 285016 T

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104836

2014-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOMMER ANTRIEBS- UND FUNKTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130725

2013-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130802

2013-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130125

2013-10-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050400692

- Effective date: 20130802

2013-08-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130725

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20120214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOMMER ANTRIEBS- UND FUNKTECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: SOMMER ANTRIEBS- UND FUNKTECHNIK GMBH#HANS-BOECKLER-STRASSE 21-27#73230 KIRCHHEIM/TECK (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SOMMER ANTRIEBS- UND FUNKTECHNIK GMBH#HANS-BOECKLER-STRASSE 21-27#73230 KIRCHHEIM/TECK (DE)

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231453 T3

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400692

2005-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104836 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT TR

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT TR

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOMMER ANTRIEBS- UND FUNKTECHNIK GMBH

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI