Global Patent Index - EP 1255917 A2

EP 1255917 A2 2002-11-13 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING A NOx CONCENTRATION OF AN EXHAUST GAS STREAM PERTAINING TO A COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING A NOx CONCENTRATION OF AN EXHAUST GAS STREAM PERTAINING TO A COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER NOx-KONZENTRATION EINES ABGASSTROMES EINER VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER LA CONCENTRATION DE NOx DANS LE COURANT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1255917 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01909650 A

Priority

  • DE 10003228 A
  • EP 0100540 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155565A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for detecting a NOx concentration of an exhaust gas stream of a combustion engine by means of a NOx-sensitive measuring device, especially a NOx sensor, that is arranged downstream in relation to a NOx storage catalyst in an exhaust gas section of the combustion engine. According to the invention, a search for a minimum (min) of a signal curve (SK) pertaining to the measuring device (18) is carried out in an operational phase of the combustion engine (10), whereby the NOx concentration passes through a value close to zero on the position of the NOx-sensitive measuring device (18) during said phase. The detected minimum (min) is taken over as the zero point for calibrating the measuring device (18).

[origin: WO0155565A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for detecting a NO>x< concentration of an exhaust gas stream of a combustion engine by means of a NO>x<-sensitive measuring device, especially a NO>x< sensor, that is arranged downstream in relation to a NO>x< storage catalyst in an exhaust gas section of the combustion engine. According to the invention, a search for a minimum (min) of a signal curve (SK) pertaining to the measuring device (18) is carried out in an operational phase of the combustion engine (10), whereby the NO>x< concentration passes through a value close to zero on the position of the NO>x<-sensitive measuring device (18) during said phase. The detected minimum (min) is taken over as the zero point for calibrating the measuring device (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/146 (2013.01); F02D 41/2441 (2013.01); F02D 41/2474 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155565A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155565 A2 20010802; WO 0155565 A3 20020110; AU 3731801 A 20010807; DE 10003228 A1 20010906; DE 50108081 D1 20051222; EP 1255917 A2 20021113; EP 1255917 B1 20051116

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108081

2016-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50108081

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150131

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108081 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-06-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING A NOX CONCENTRATION OF AN EXHAUST GAS STREAM PERTAINING TO A COMBUSTION ENGINE

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAHN, HERMANN

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HINZE, SOEREN

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI