Global Patent Index - EP 1255922 A2

EP 1255922 A2 2002-11-13 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A MULTI-CYLINDER ENGINE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES HAVING A MULTI-FLOW EMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A MULTI-CYLINDER ENGINE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES HAVING A MULTI-FLOW EMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BETRIEBES EINES MEHRZYLINDERMOTORS FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE MIT EINER MEHRFLUTIGEN ABGASREINIGUNGSANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER LE MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR MULTICYLINDRE POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES COMPRENANT UNE INSTALLATION DE PURIFICATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT A PLUSIEURS FLUX

Publication

EP 1255922 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01902335 A

Priority

  • DE 10003903 A
  • EP 0100542 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10003903A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for controlling operation of a multi-cylinder engine for motor vehicles having a multi-flow emission control system. According to the invention, the emission control system consists of at least two exhaust gas sections which are allocated to a number of cylinders (bench) and have at least one NO>x< storage catalyst respectively and a gas sensor. According to the inventive method and device, the operating modes of each bench are adjusted (co-ordinated control) in all exhaust gas sections according to a co-ordination mode and a catalyst state and/or an exhaust gas emission.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 13/04 (2010.01); F01N 13/10 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 13/011 (2014.06); F02D 41/0235 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02D 41/1443 (2013.01); F01N 13/107 (2013.01); F01N 2550/03 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0808 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155574A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10003903 A1 20010802; DE 10003903 B4 20091217; AU 3019401 A 20010807; DE 50115654 D1 20101118; EP 1255922 A2 20021113; EP 1255922 B1 20101006; WO 0155574 A2 20010802; WO 0155574 A3 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115654

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115654

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101006

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110118

2011-11-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50115654

- Effective date: 20110707

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110118

2011-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110707

2011-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50115654

2010-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115654 P 20101118

2010-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-12-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081124

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POTT, EKKEHARD

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPIEGEL, LEO

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OTTE, JUERGEN

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POTT, EKKEHARD

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPIEGEL, LEO

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OTTE, JUERGEN

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI